+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 939) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-22-19.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2185) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Ihara.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 620).
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2058), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
- Transmitted to Senate.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1843), recommending referral to JUD.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor