+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1342-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-21-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor