+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 667).
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Pouha voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, McDermott, Oshiro, Tupola, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 700) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3694) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-16 2:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 372).
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Johanson, Matsumoto, McDermott, Pouha, Say, Tupola, Ward voting no (7) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1443-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Hashem, C. Lee, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Woodson.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-24-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 28
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Offered