+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from TRN/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1141), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN/HSG on Friday, 03-19-21 11:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRN/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 25
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Offered