+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with Fale, Kawakami voting aye with reservations; Cullen, McKelvey, Ward voting no (3) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1649), recommending adoption.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1362) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 329.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Offered