+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1659-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Ing, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 1 Noes: Representative(s) DeCoite; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 312.
- The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 312.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-21-18 8:45AM in conference room 312.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor