+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE/JDL/WAM.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 672).
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1653), recommending adoption.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Jordan, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from LAB/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1258), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Ohno, Takai, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hanohano, Takumi, Fale.
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Ichiyama, Ing, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Takumi, Yamane.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB/HED on Friday, 03-22-13 11:30AM in conference room 309.
- Re-referred to LAB/HED, FIN, referral sheet 41
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 37
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor