+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Johanson, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1018-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 02-08-16 9:00AM in conference room 312.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor