+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1670-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McDermott.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-27-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- To be offered.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor