+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1675), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-15 1:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HSH, WAM.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 393).
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1489) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1266) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-24-15 10:00AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday 03-24-15 at 10:00am.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-19-15 8:45AM in conference room 329.
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor