+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Monday, 03-25-13 8:45AM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/OMH, TRN, referral sheet 37
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor