+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 437).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1222) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 02-13-19.
- Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 299) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor