+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 077, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178).
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Act 077, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 46).
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 46) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, San Buenaventura, Gates; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 2:00PM in conference room 016.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Rhoads, Riviere Co-Chairs; Harimoto, Fevella.
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815).
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Changed: Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair. Representative Gates discharged as Member; Added as Co-Chair.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, San Buenaventura, Luke Co-Chairs; Gates, McDermott.
- Re-referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 810) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2024) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1450) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 89).
- Passed First Reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
- Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor