+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 313).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Har, Ito, Jordan, Oshiro, Say voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to WAL/OMH, referral sheet 29
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor