+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 393) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-06-19.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor