+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 139), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor