+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA, WAM.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 60).
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Rhoads voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 623), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-14-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 204) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Nakashima, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Takumi.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-04-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor