+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-13 8:50AM in conference room 312.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-13.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Monday, 02-04-13 11:00AM in House conference room Auditorium.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to AGR/EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.