+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 386) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-07-17 11:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor