+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Act 045, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
On June 1, 2023 in the House:
- Act 045, on 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
On May 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23.
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 64).
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 64) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Moriwaki, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Sayama, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick.
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 9:00AM; Conference Room 016.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 9:00AM; Conference Room 016.
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
On April 24, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 971).
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; San Buenaventura, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Aquino, Awa.
On April 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Sayama, Garrett Co-Chairs; Hussey-Burdick, Alcos.
On April 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 802) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1872) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
On April 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from GVO/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1409) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/HHS, WAM.
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 370).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 771), recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor