+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 63), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-05-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, HLT, JUD, referral sheet 4
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor