+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Act 004, on 4/9/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 004, 4/9/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 371).
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-24-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 948) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara, Slom.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 252).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Jordan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 750) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Nakashima.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:05PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-15 at 1:05PM in room 325.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-27-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 334), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-13-15 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 4
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor