+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 432).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 949) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD , referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor