+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 257), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation to the Department of Health for Hazard Evaluation and Emergency Response Preparedness. (Gov. Msg. No. 168).
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-05-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor