+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC, WAM.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 4).
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 476-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 343) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Thielen.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor