+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 358).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1107), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 25, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 621) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-15-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 214) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-07-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.