+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Act 203, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 203, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 169).
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 169) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Cullen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Shimabukuro, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:45PM in conference room 329.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; K. Kahele.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Har, Matsumoto.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 529) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1478) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-17 1:40PM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1062) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:55PM in conference room 229.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 165).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 938), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 297) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor