+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cheape, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Morikawa, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 422) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa, Cheape; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Jordan.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-11-13 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with Representative(s) Cheape, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale, Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 01-28-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor