+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
- Reported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 181) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, McDermott.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
- Re-referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor