+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Har, Ichiyama, Matsumoto.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 802) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1948) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 04-02-19 10:15AM in conference room 016.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1309) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 429).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1188) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 02-13-19.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor