+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 008, 4/16/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Act 008, on 4/16/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 401).
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-06-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1293) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Nishihara, Slom.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 92).
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 587), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, Yamane, McDermott.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-02-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-15.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-18-15 4:00PM in conference room 325.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-18-15 4:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 13
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 4
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor