+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from WLH/LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 87) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Johanson, Ohno, Quinlan, Tokioka.
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Wildberger, Thielen.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH/LHE on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:05PM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH/LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor