+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 088, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189).
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- Act 088, on 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189).
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 629).
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har excused (1).
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 628).
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-17.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Espero.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 619) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1492) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 304).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 978) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 598) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Ward.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 4
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor