+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 224.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 2:15PM in conference room 224.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:15PM in conference room 224.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 2:15PM in conference room 224.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 2:05PM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, San Buenaventura, Holt Co-Chairs; Cachola, Okimoto.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 797) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1994) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 4:00PM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1483) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 426).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1238) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
- Reported from TIA/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 423) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Mizuno, Say.
- The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA/HSH on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:45AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TIA/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor