+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 91, 5/31/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Act 091, on 5/31/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Rhoads voting no (1) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 140).
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 140) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Jordan, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 1:55PM in conference room 229.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-13 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Jordan, Fukumoto.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 540) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1273) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:20AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 990) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-13 2:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 305).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 769) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice 03-05-13.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
- Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 374) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-13 11:00AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-13 at 11:00am.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Wednesday, 02-06-13 10:05AM in House conference room 329.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor