+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:16PM in conference room 224.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 12:31PM in conference room 224.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 11:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 11:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 11:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 11:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; K. Rhoads, Riviere Co-Chairs.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Tupola.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 618) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-11-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1590) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 1:40PM in conference room 211.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:15PM in conference room 224.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 157).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 23) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.