+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-23-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-23-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 368) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 4
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor