+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Act 100, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 100, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 887).
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 886).
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 881).
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Eli, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900).
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
- Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 795) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2000) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1367) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to GVO, WAM.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 235).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 992), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, McDermott.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 382) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:20AM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.