+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
- Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 526), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 57) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor