+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699).
- Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and none excused.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 26).
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 26) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Takayama, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 4:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 4:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 4:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Galuteria, Ihara, L. Thielen.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Takayama, Tupola.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 363).
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 431) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1310) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/JDL deferred the measure until 03-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/JDL deferred the measure until 03-24-15 1:20PM in conference room 229.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/JDL deferred the measure until 03-19-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 247).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to PSM/JDL.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Kong voting no (3) and Representative(s) Nakashima excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 603) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Nakashima.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor