+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 260).
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Todd.
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor