+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 316-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-08-18 10:00AM in House conference room 429.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-01-18 10:00AM in conference room 429.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-01-18 10:00AM in House conference room 429.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor