+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 22, 2023 in the House:
- Act 106, on 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
On June 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Act 106, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
On May 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 11) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 11).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2023 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, Amato, Sayama, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 830).
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Amato, Sayama, Pierick.
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-23 2:30PM in conference room 329.
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900).
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Elefante Co-Chair; Awa.
On April 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 787) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1822) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1393) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-21-23 10:15AM; Conference Room 229.
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPN, JDC.
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 80).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 844), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Onishi.
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 619) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-23.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-10-23 10:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor