+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-07-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 4
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor