+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Act 075, on 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 75, 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 750).
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Thielen excused (2).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 736).
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 735).
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13.
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Belatti, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 537) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-09-13.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1326) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 895) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 299).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kobayashi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Woodson.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-01-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor