+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Vis Videoconference.
- The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-21 10:00AM.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
- Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor