+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 630) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Garcia.
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 213) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, HET, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor