+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 395) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor