+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 153) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:45AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor