+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to THA/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 297).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 752) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-15-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 304) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-13 9:00AM in conference room 325.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-13.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 01-28-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, OMH, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor